This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 08:06:20 (UTC).

Diepola LLC vs Crews

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Diepola LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Crews. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Diepola LLC

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Crews, Michael

Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin, Justin M

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Reed, Rebecca L

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Miller, Scott Alan

Attorney at DILLON MILLER AHUJA & BOSS LLP

5872 Owens Ave Suite 200

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

Notice of Errata re Complaint

Notice of Errata filed by Diepola LLC.

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust

Complaint

Complaint filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Diepola LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust. Refers to: Diepola LLC

Answer

Answer filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diepola LLC; Diepola LLC. Refers to: Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal re Michael Crews

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Diepola LLC; Diepola LLC.

Answer to Cross Complaint

Answer filed by Diepola LLC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Diepola LLC. Filed By: Diepola LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Diepola LLC; Diepola LLC. Filed By: Diepola LLC (Cross - Defendant); Diepola LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust. Filed By: Crews, Michael (Defendant); Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust. Refers to: Diepola LLC Filed By: Crews, Michael (Cross - Complainant); Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust. Filed By: Crews, Michael (Defendant); Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diepola LLC; Diepola LLC. Refers to: Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff); Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Diepola LLC. Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Diepola LLC. Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Diepola LLC. Refers to: Crews, Michael; Michael Crews as Trustee of the Michael Crews 2007 Revocable Trust Filed By: Diepola LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Justin M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, REBECCA L