Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/13/2019 at 00:34:04 (UTC).

DICKS vs IRELAND

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 DICKS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IRELAND. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DICKS, MICHAEL

S BURN HOLDINGS INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

IRELAND, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Kurz, Andrew A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW A KURZ

120 Birmingham Drive 200

Cardiff, CA 92007

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Phillips, Frederick C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Stipulation and Order to Stay All Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC; IRELAND, JOHN.

Answer

Answer filed by IRELAND, JOHN.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by IRELAND, JOHN. Refers to: DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER THEREON) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Declaration of Michael Dicks In Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction

Declaration - Other (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Notice of Lodgment of Exhibit In Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction

Notice of Lodgment (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction

Proposed Order (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Proof of Service by E-Mail

Proof of Service (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

Complaint

Complaint filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Refers to: IRELAND, JOHN

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Refers to: IRELAND, JOHN

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC; IRELAND, JOHN. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff); IRELAND, JOHN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/25/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by IRELAND, JOHN. Refers to: DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC Filed By: IRELAND, JOHN (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by IRELAND, JOHN. Filed By: IRELAND, JOHN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER THEREON) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (05/16/2019) filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 05/16/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Refers to: IRELAND, JOHN Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Refers to: IRELAND, JOHN Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by DICKS, MICHAEL; S BURN HOLDINGS INC. Refers to: IRELAND, JOHN Filed By: DICKS, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); S BURN HOLDINGS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillips, Frederick C