This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/25/2020 at 02:45:39 (UTC).

DIAZ-MARTIN VS ULLAH

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 DIAZ-MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ULLAH. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA

Defendant

ULLAH, ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Padilla, Michael D

Attorney at THE PADILLA LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant Attorney

DOMINGUEZ, MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER

Complaint

Complaint filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 12/19/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA.

Notice Of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ULLAH, ALEXANDER.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by ULLAH, ALEXANDER.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ULLAH, ALEXANDER.

Answer To Complaint

Answer filed by ULLAH, ALEXANDER.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/19/2019 01:30:00 PM.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJury demanded by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/19/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 12/19/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA. Refers to: ULLAH, ALEXANDER Filed By: DIAZ-MARTN, IRMA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGUEZ MANUEL