This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 13:59:28 (UTC).

Diaz & Associates Inc vs. Julio Garcia

Case Summary

On 10/25/2010 Diaz Associates Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Julio Garcia. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ & ASSOCIATES INC

Defendant

GARCIA, JULIO ; AKA : GARCIA, JULIO CESAR JR;AKA : OSORNIA, JULIO;AKA : GARCIA OSORNIA, JULIO CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPP, THOMAS EUGENE JR

Attorney at STEPP LAW CORPORATION

15707 Rockfield Boulevard 101

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 01/12/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Garcia, Julio on Amended Complaint filed by Diaz & Associates Inc .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Application for Entry of Judgment (and Judgment) submitted by Diaz & Associates Inc rejected on 06/05/2012.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 08/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Diaz & Associates Inc rejected on 07/12/2012. Refers to: Garcia, Julio

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Diaz & Associates Inc rejected on 09/27/2012.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Stale Dated Check) submitted by Diaz & Associates Inc rejected on 12/10/2013.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Stale Dated Check) submitted by Diaz & Associates Inc rejected on 12/10/2013. Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • ***ABSTRACT RECEIVED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Diaz & Associates Inc and against Garcia, Julio for $ 723.39, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 200.00, interest: $ 844.34, prejudgment costs: $ 285.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2052.73.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2011
  • The default filed by Diaz & Associates Inc was entered as to Garcia, Julio on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Judgment submitted by plaintiff rejected on 4-04-11. Prayer for damages indicates $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default and/or Judgment Received for Processing. Clerks judg desk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Diaz & Associates Inc. Refers to: Garcia, Julio Filed By: Diaz & Associates Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.