This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 07:11:53 (UTC).

Dewse vs Albertsons Companies Inc

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Dewse filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Albertsons Companies Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dewse, Allison

Defendants

Albertsons Companies Inc

The Vons Companies Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glick, Noam

Markley, Shaun A

Nicholas, Craig M

Attorney at NICHOLAS & TOMASEVIC LLP

SCHULTE, JAKE

Attorney at NICHOLAS & TOMASEVIC LLP

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time for Albertsons Companines Inc to Respond to The Complaint and Order) filed by Dewse, Allison; Albertsons Companies Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dewse, Allison.

Amendment to Complaint naming Doe 1 as The Vons Companies, Inc.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: The Vons Companies Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time for Albertsons Companines Inc to Respond to The Complaint and Order) filed by Dewse, Allison; Albertsons Companies Inc. Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff); Albertsons Companies Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: The Vons Companies Inc Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Dewse, Allison. Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc; The Vons Companies Inc Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dewse, Allison. Refers to: Albertsons Companies Inc Filed By: Dewse, Allison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKLEY, SHAUN A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHULTE, JAKE W