Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 09:09:05 (UTC).

Destiny Marie Tudara vs Kenneth Cornett

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Destiny Marie Tudara filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Kenneth Cornett. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Turdara, Destiny Marie

Respondents

Cornett, Gloria

Cornett, Kenneth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/28/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail (unable to forward) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Cornett, Gloria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Cornett, Kenneth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 07/28/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/29/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing (As to Gloria Cornett) filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful service) filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Refers to: Cornett, Kenneth Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of unsuccessful service) filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Refers to: Cornett, Gloria Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Refers to: Garza, Dameon; Cornett, Kenneth; Cornett, Gloria Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Refers to: Garza, Dameon; Cornett, Kenneth; Cornett, Gloria Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Turdara, Destiny Marie. Filed By: Turdara, Destiny Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less