This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:09:06 (UTC).

Dervic vs. The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Dervic filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dervic, Husejin

Dervic, Zera

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Coastal Active Living, LLC

Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a

PFC Enterprises Inc; DBA : Allen Properties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Villasenor, Christopher A

12396 World Trade Dr Suite 211

San Diego, CA 92128

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Sakai, Kimberley H. G.

Attorney at WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont Drive 300

Irvine, CA 92612

Lloyd, Michael A

11845 W Olympic Boulevard 710

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; Allen Properties; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; Allen Properties; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; Allen Properties; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: Allen Properties

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.

2023-01-18 Taylor Trim & Supply's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc..

2023-01-18 Taylor Trim & Supply's Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc

2023-01-18 Taylor Trim & Supply's Summons on XC

Original Summons filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc; Filed By: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc. (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc; Filed By: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc. (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc..; Filed By: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Coastal Active Living, LLC (Cross - Complainant); PFC Enterprises Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Coastal Active Living, LLC (Cross - Complainant); PFC Enterprises Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc.; Filed By: Coastal Active Living, LLC (Defendant); PFC Enterprises Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Filed By: Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff); Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: PFC Enterprises Inc; Filed By: Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff); Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: Coastal Active Living, LLC; Filed By: Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff); Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Dervic, Husejin; Dervic, Zera. Refers to: Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff); Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff); Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff); Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dervic, Zera; Dervic, Husejin. Refers to: The Salman and Elaine Rabie Family Trust - PerBe17a; Coastal Active Living, LLC; PFC Enterprises Inc; Taylor Trim & Supply, Inc.; Filed By: Dervic, Zera (Plaintiff); Dervic, Husejin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less