This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 08:05:48 (UTC).

Derr vs Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Derr filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derr, Traci

Defendant

Regents of the University of California; DBA : UC San Diego Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

3130 Bonita Road 200

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Heath, Jacob M

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

1000 Marsh Rd

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Regents of the University of California.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Regents of the University of California received but not filed on 04/15/2022.

Declaration - Other [Jacob H. Heath Decl ISO Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint]

Declaration - Other (OF JACOB M. HEATH) filed by Regents of the University of California.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Regents of the University of California.

Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Demurrer filed by Regents of the University of California.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Regents of the University of California.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Regents of the University of California received but not filed on 04/15/2022.

Declaration - Other [Jacob H. Heath Decl ISO Motion to Strike Complaint]

Declaration - Other (OF JACOB M. HEATH) filed by Regents of the University of California.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Regents of the University of California.

Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint

Motion to Strike filed by Regents of the University of California.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Regents of the University of California.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Regents of the University of California.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Regents of the University of California received but not filed on 04/15/2022.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF JACOB M. HEATH) filed by Regents of the University of California.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Regents of the University of California.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by Regents of the University of California.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Regents of the University of California.; Filed By: Regents of the University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Derr, Traci (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Derr, Traci (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Derr, Traci (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Derr, Traci. Refers to: Regents of the University of California; Filed By: Derr, Traci (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATH, JACOB M.