This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 08:08:56 (UTC).

Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing vs Lakeshore Gardens Property LP

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lakeshore Gardens Property LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W POLLACK and EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

GREGORY W POLLACK

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLYMENT AND HOUSING

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

Defendants

COVIAN-ALVISO, ROSA

BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC

LAKESHORE GARDENS PROPERTY LP

Birtcher, Arthur B

Favazza, Mary

Eales, Jeffrey W

Lakeshore Gardens Properties Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELDIN, ALEXANDRA

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

2218 Krausen Drive Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Defendant Attorney

DICKSON, ROBERT M

4 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 900

Santa Ana, CA 92707

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Answer to Complaint in Intervention

Answer filed by Birtcher, Arthur B; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Eales, Jeffrey W; Lakeshore Gardens Properties Inc; Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; Favazza, Mary; Cobian Alviso, Rosa.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Anderson, Jerry. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; Lakeshore Gardens Properties Inc; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Birtcher, Arthur; Eales, Jeffrey; Favazza, Mary; Cobian Alviso, Rosa

Complaint in Intervention

Complaint in Intervention filed by Anderson, Jerry. Refers to: Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Lakeshore Gardens Properties Inc; Birtcher, Arthur; Eales, Jeffrey; Favazza, Mary

Original Summons

[Another document for ROA# 21]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Proof of Service by Mail-Plaintiff DFEH

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Anderson, Jerry.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing.

STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Orders signed 2/28/19) filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing; Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Cobian Alviso, Rosa.

Order - Other

Proposed Order submitted by Anderson, Jerry received but not filed on 01/28/2019.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Anderson, Jerry

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Anderson, Jerry

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Anderson, Jerry. Filed By: Anderson, Jerry (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Anderson, Jerry. Filed By: Anderson, Jerry (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Lakeshore Gardens Properties Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Birtcher, Arthur B .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Eales, Jeffrey W .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Favazza, Mary .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Lakeshore Gardens Property LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention dismissed with prejudice as to Covian-Alviso, Rosa .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (CCP 170.6) filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Anderson, Jerry Filed By: Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Anderson, Jerry Filed By: Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Department of Fair Emplyment and Housing. Refers to: Lakeshore Gardens Property LP; BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC; Covian-Alviso, Rosa; Anderson, Jerry Filed By: Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIRTCHER ANDERSON REALTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DICKSON, ROBERT M