This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 08:11:00 (UTC).

Dennis vs Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Dennis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis, Mike

Defendants

DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC; DBA : Denault's Ace Hardware

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kiesel, Paul R

8648 Wilshire Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Palmer, Melanie Meneses

Attorney at KIESEL LAW LLP

8648 Wilshire Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

Cools, Joshua D.

Attorney at EVANS FEARS & SCHUTTERT LLP

4440 Von Karman Avenue 250

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Dennis, Mike; Dennis, Mike.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Dennis, Mike.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Answer (First Papers)

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Answer (First Papers)

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC. Filed By: Monsanto Company (Defendant); DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC. Filed By: Monsanto Company (Defendant); DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Dennis, Mike. Filed By: Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Dennis, Mike; Dennis, Mike. Filed By: Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff); Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC Filed By: Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC Filed By: Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dennis, Mike. Refers to: Monsanto Company; DENAULT'S HARDWARE-HOME CENTERS INC Filed By: Dennis, Mike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALMER MELANIE MENESES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIESEL PAUL ROBERT