This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 09:37:31 (UTC).

Delong vs Myers

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Delong filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Delong, Betty

Delong, Richard

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Myers, Brent Nicolas

Myers, Heather

Perales, Erica Jazmin

Quezada, Zeferino Perales

Weil, Ruth

MYERS, BRENT

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Perales, Erica Jazmin

Quezada, Zeferino Perales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Agu, Kenechi R

Attorney at KRA LEGAL PC

2233 W 190Th St

Torrance, CA 90504

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRANDY, JAMES L

Attorney at CULLINS & GRANDY LLP

23141 Verdugo Drive 204

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Coderre, Matthew

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCI

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica

Complaint

Complaint filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Quezada, Zeferino Perales; Perales, Erica Jazmin.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Myers, Heather; MYERS, BRENT.

DEFENDANTS BRENT MYERS AND HEATHER MYERS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Myers, Heather; MYERS, BRENT.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Quezada, Zeferino Perales; Perales, Erica Jazmin. Refers to: Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Quezada, Zeferino Perales; Perales, Erica Jazmin. Refers to: Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard Filed By: Quezada, Zeferino Perales (Cross - Complainant); Perales, Erica Jazmin (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Myers, Heather; MYERS, BRENT. Filed By: Myers, Heather (Defendant); MYERS, BRENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Myers, Heather; MYERS, BRENT. Filed By: Myers, Heather (Defendant); MYERS, BRENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Quezada, Zeferino Perales; Perales, Erica Jazmin. Filed By: Quezada, Zeferino Perales (Defendant); Perales, Erica Jazmin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard. Filed By: Delong, Betty (Plaintiff); Delong, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard. Filed By: Delong, Betty (Plaintiff); Delong, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard. Filed By: Delong, Betty (Plaintiff); Delong, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Delong, Betty; Delong, Richard. Filed By: Delong, Betty (Plaintiff); Delong, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/28/2022 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica; MYERS, BRENT Filed By: Delong, Richard (Plaintiff); Delong, Betty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica Filed By: Delong, Richard (Plaintiff); Delong, Betty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Delong, Richard; Delong, Betty. Refers to: Myers, Brent; Myers, Heather; Weil, Ruth; Quezada, Zeferino; Perales, Erica Filed By: Delong, Richard (Plaintiff); Delong, Betty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CODERRE, MATTHEW