This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 14:41:16 (UTC).

Deborah McMurray vs. Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 Deborah McMurray filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMURRAY, DEBORAH

Defendants

HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC

HLT CONRAD DOMESTIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOWEY, ERIC A

Attorney at GOWEY LAW APC

100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

GUY, DOUGLAS D

Attorney at GATES O DOHERTY GONTER GUY LLP

15373 Innovation Drive 170

San Diego, CA 92128

 

Court Documents

Doe 1

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc

Answer

Answer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by McMurray, Deborah.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/08/2017 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to continue trial and related dates) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order Continuing Trial and Related Dates) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/30/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/30/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/20/2018 at 08:30AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/13/2018 at 09:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing (Order Continuing Trial and Related Dates) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to continue trial and related dates) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Returned Mail (as to notice of hearing on Trial Readiness Conference) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Gowey, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Returned Mail (as to Notice of hearing on Civil Jury Trial) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Gowey, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by McMurray, Deborah. Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by McMurray, Deborah. Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2017 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by McMurray, Deborah. Refers to: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: McMurray, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUY DOUGLAS D.