Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 19:01:33 (UTC).

Deborah Lynn Elizabeth Arboleda vs. Georgina Sandoval Arboleda

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Deborah Lynn Elizabeth Arboleda filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Georgina Sandoval Arboleda. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth

Respondent

Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against Georgina Sandoval Arboleda was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketResponse filed by Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina. Refers to: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Filed By: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina. Refers to: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Filed By: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/11/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth. Refers to: Sandoval Arboleda, Georgina Filed By: Arboleda, Deborah Lynn Elizabeth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less