This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/30/2023 at 08:03:57 (UTC).

DEAN vs Southerland

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 DEAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Southerland. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dean, Donna Gaile

Dean, John Robert

Donna Gaile Dean as co-trustee of The Dean Family Trust Dated September 24, 1999

JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999

Defendants

Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

SOUTHERLAND, RUDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haddad, Luiey G

Defendant Attorney

Hepworth, James D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999; Dean, John Robert; Dean, Donna Gaile. Refers to: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company; SOUTHERLAND, RUDI

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

[A document for ROA# 3]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION) filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION) filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company.; Filed By: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freestone, Loren for 07/07/2023 at 09:45:00 AM in C-64 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999; Dean, John Robert; Dean, Donna Gaile. Refers to: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company; SOUTHERLAND, RUDI; Filed By: JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999 (Plaintiff); Dean, John Robert (Plaintiff); Dean, Donna Gaile (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999; Dean, John Robert; Dean, Donna Gaile. Refers to: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company; SOUTHERLAND, RUDI; Filed By: JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999 (Plaintiff); Dean, John Robert (Plaintiff); Dean, Donna Gaile (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999; Dean, John Robert; Dean, Donna Gaile; Donna Gaile Dean as co-trustee of The Dean Family Trust Dated September 24, 1999. Refers to: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company; SOUTHERLAND, RUDI; Filed By: JOHN ROBERT DEAN as co-trustee of THE DEAN FAMILY TRUST Dated September 24, 1999 (Plaintiff); Dean, John Robert (Plaintiff); Dean, Donna Gaile (Plaintiff); Donna Gaile Dean as co-trustee of The Dean Family Trust Dated September 24, 1999 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less