This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:10:40 (UTC).

DEACERO vs JD Reinforcing Inc

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 DEACERO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JD Reinforcing Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEACERO

Defendant

JD Reinforcing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOSKA, STEVEN A

Defendant Attorney

Plumtree, A Maria

Attorney at PLUMTREE & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc

Answer

Answer filed by JD Reinforcing Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by JD Reinforcing Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by JD Reinforcing Inc. Filed By: JD Reinforcing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by JD Reinforcing Inc. Filed By: JD Reinforcing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc Filed By: DEACERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc Filed By: DEACERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc Filed By: DEACERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by DEACERO. Refers to: JD Reinforcing Inc Filed By: DEACERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEACERO USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JD REINFORCING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLUMTREE ANGELINA MARIA