This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:08:18 (UTC).

DE LA TORRE VS JACOBS & CUSHMAN SAN DIEGO FOOD BANK

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 DE LA TORRE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JACOBS CUSHMAN SAN DIEGO FOOD BANK. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De La Torre, Angel

Defendants

Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank

RANDSTAD US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Jessica L

Attorney at AEGIS LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: RANDSTAD US LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank Filed By: De La Torre, Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: RANDSTAD US LLC Filed By: De La Torre, Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC Filed By: De La Torre, Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC Filed By: De La Torre, Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by De La Torre, Angel. Refers to: Jacobs and Cushman San Diego Food Bank; RANDSTAD US LLC Filed By: De La Torre, Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDSTAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Jessica L.