This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 23:02:09 (UTC).

Day vs. Bank of America NA

Case Summary

On 07/31/2012 Day filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bank of America NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Day, Cheryl

Defendant

Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTERSEN, WILLIAM D

Attorney at PETTERSON & BARK

1620 Union St

San Diego, CA 92101-2926

Defendant Attorney

SHAHAM, YARON

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD

18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer

Answer filed by Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association. Refers to: Day, Cheryl

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 03/29/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association. Filed By: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 03/29/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association. Refers to: Day, Cheryl Filed By: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Day, Cheryl. Refers to: Bank of America NA a nationally chartered banking association Filed By: Day, Cheryl (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.