This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2020 at 12:33:56 (UTC).

Davis vs Heck

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Davis filed an Other lawsuit against Heck. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, PAMELA

Defendants

SYNERGY ONE LENDING INC

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

HECK, TREVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEUTHOLD, RICHARD R

Attorney at HACIENDA CORPORATE CENTER

12625 High Bluff Dr Ste 306

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorneys

PFEIFER, MICHAEL R

Goria, Charles F

Attorney at GORIA WEBER & JARVIS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Synergy One) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Synergy One Lending Inc

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by Synergy One Lending Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Synergy One Lending Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Synergy One Lending Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (SYNERGY ONE LENDING INC) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Synergy One Lending Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (TREVOR HECK) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Davis, Pamela.

Answer

Answer filed by Heck, Trevor.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Heck, Trevor.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/14/2019 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Davis, Pamela.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) set for 03/20/2020 at 09:00 AM vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial set for 03/27/2020 at 08:30 AM vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Synergy One) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Synergy One Lending Inc Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Synergy One Lending Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 01/31/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSummary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 01/31/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (SYNERGY ONE LENDING INC) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Synergy One Lending Inc Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (TREVOR HECK) filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Davis, Pamela. Refers to: Heck, Trevor; Synergy One Lending Inc; All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, or any Cloud on Plaintiff's Title thereto Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Davis, Pamela. Filed By: Davis, Pamela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less