This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2018 at 10:03:01 (UTC).

DARRYL PATRICE GARTLEY vs. ANITA HIRST

Case Summary

On 10/04/2011 DARRYL PATRICE GARTLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANITA HIRST. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE

Defendants

HIRST, ANITA

TROMPETER, AARON

SHANE, GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTEGNA, GREGORY A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY ALAN MONTEGNA

294 Shasta St

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

KONOSKE, GREGORY P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Drive 250

San Diego, CA 92127

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash (Civil) heard 02/03/2012 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 05/30/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 05/30/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE, on 12/12/2011, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE, on 10/04/2011, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Answer filed by TROMPETER, AARON; HIRST, ANITA. Refers to: GARTLEY, DARRYL Filed By: TROMPETER, AARON (Defendant); HIRST, ANITA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 07/06/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Proof of Service by Publication filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA; TROMPETER, AARON; SHANE, GREGORY Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2011
  • Motion - Other (TO QUASH FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION) filed by TROMPETER, AARON; HIRST, ANITA. Refers to: GARTLEY, DARRYL Filed By: TROMPETER, AARON (Defendant); HIRST, ANITA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • Motion to Quash (Civil) scheduled for 02/03/2012 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Certificate of Service filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA; TROMPETER, AARON; SHANE, GREGORY Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA; TROMPETER, AARON; SHANE, GREGORY Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Complaint filed by GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE. Refers to: HIRST, ANITA; TROMPETER, AARON; SHANE, GREGORY Filed By: GARTLEY, DARRYL PATRICE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.