Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 01:19:33 (UTC).

Daranciang vs Long

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Daranciang filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Long. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daranciang, Roger

Respondents

Long, Jim

Long, James Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/18/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Daranciang, Roger. Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process filed by Daranciang, Roger; Long, James Theodore. Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner); Long, James Theodore (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/18/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (and proof of service) filed by Long, James Theodore. Filed By: Long, James Theodore (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Daranciang, Roger. Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Daranciang, Roger. Refers to: Long, Jim; Long, James Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daranciang, Roger. Refers to: Long, Jim Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Daranciang, Roger. Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Daranciang, Roger. Filed By: Daranciang, Roger (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less