This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 08:08:43 (UTC).

Daniel vs Best Western International Inc

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 Daniel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Best Western International Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel, Brandon

Defendants

Best Western International Inc

Best Western Seven Seas

Toczylowski, Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen Janfaza, Ilan N

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freestone, Loren for 08/04/2023 at 09:30:00 AM in C-64 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe; Filed By: Daniel, Brandon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe; Filed By: Daniel, Brandon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Daniel, Brandon. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; Best Western Seven Seas; Toczylowski, Joe; Filed By: Daniel, Brandon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less