This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 00:25:52 (UTC).

Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 vs. Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011

Case Summary

On 02/14/2014 Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT P DAHLQUIST and RONALD F. FRAZIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007

Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007

DANIEL J HICKEY TRUSTEES OF THE HICKEY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED

EDITHA R HICKEY TRUSTEES OF THE HICKEY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011

Hickey, David L

Hickey, Karen D

Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann R Miles dated 07/21/05

MELINDA MILES TRUSTEE OF THE SANTA B HICKEY TRUST FBO ANN MILES DATED

COLLEEN C WARRINGTON TRUSTEE OF THE COLLEEN C WARRINGTON TRUST DATED

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MELINDA MILES TRUSTEE OF THE SANTA B HICKEY TRUST FBO ANN MILES DATED

DANIEL J HICKEY TRUSTEES OF THE HICKEY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED

EDITHA R HICKEY TRUSTEES OF THE HICKEY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED

Intervenor

MELINDA MILES, TRUSTEE OF THE ANN RYAN MILES TRUST DATED

368 Highland Ave

San Francisco, CA 94110

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Carmeli, Michele

Attorney at SERBIN & CARMELI ATTORNEYS AT LAW

7700 Irvine Center Drive 800

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KURZ, ANDREW A

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011; Hickey, David; Hickey, Karen; Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05

Proof of Service by Mail (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE) filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey

Proof of Service by Mail (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE) filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D. Refers to: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

Answer

Answer filed by Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05. Refers to: Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011

Motion to Intervene

Motion - Other (TO INTERVENE 8/1/14) filed by Miles, Ann; Melinda Miles, Trustee of the Ann Ryan Miles Trust dated 1/09/05.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D; Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D; Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D; Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D; Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D; Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Melinda Miles, Trustee of the Ann Ryan Miles Trust dated 1/09/05.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Melinda Miles, Trustee of the Ann Ryan Miles Trust dated 1/09/05.

Proposed Order

Order - Other (10/2) submitted by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 received but not filed on 10/01/2014.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/02/2014 08:30:00 AM.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hickey, Karen D .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hickey, David L .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Filed By: Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05. Filed By: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05. Filed By: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE) filed by Hickey, David L; Hickey, Karen D. Refers to: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 Filed By: Hickey, David L (Defendant); Hickey, Karen D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 Filed By: Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff); Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011; Hickey, David; Hickey, Karen; Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 Filed By: Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff); Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011; Hickey, David; Hickey, Karen; Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 Filed By: Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff); Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007; Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007. Refers to: Colleen C Warrington Trustee of the Colleen C Warrington Trust dated 07/12/2011; Hickey, David; Hickey, Karen; Melinda Miles Trustee of the Santa B Hickey Trust fbo Ann Miles dated 07/21/05 Filed By: Daniel J Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff); Editha R Hickey Trustees of the Hickey Revocable Trust dated 9/19/2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.