This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 03:30:51 (UTC).

DABABNEH VS SHARP HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 DABABNEH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHARP HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dababneh, Basmah

Defendants

Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center

Sharp Healthcare

Yu MD, Nicholas

Sharp Healthcare; DBA : Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pasternack, Barry A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BARRY PASTERNACK

1230 Columbia Street Suite 540

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

BRADFORD, THOMAS R

Attorney at PETERSON BRADFORD BURKWITZ GREGORIO BURKW

100 N First Street 300

Burbank, CA 91502-1845

Higle, Patrick F

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Notice of Case Management Conference Hearing Results

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference Hearing Results) filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

Notice of Remote Appearance (Notices)

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Yu MD, Nicholas.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Yu MD, Nicholas.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Yu MD, Nicholas.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY) filed by Yu MD, Nicholas.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer (WITH POS) filed by Yu MD, Nicholas.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center; Sharp Healthcare.

Answer

Answer filed by Sharp Healthcare.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sharp Healthcare.; Filed By: Sharp Healthcare (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference Hearing Results) filed by Sharp Healthcare.; Filed By: Sharp Healthcare (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Dababneh, Basmah.; Filed By: Dababneh, Basmah (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Dababneh, Basmah.; Filed By: Dababneh, Basmah (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Dababneh, Basmah.; Filed By: Dababneh, Basmah (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dababneh, Basmah.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less