This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 05:58:10 (UTC).

DA LUZ vs MCCOURT DDS

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 DA LUZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MCCOURT DDS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Da Luz, Maria

Defendants

McCourt DDS, Danielle

Ashmore Dental Group Corporation; DBA : Dental Express Point Loma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bertsche, Louis J

2333 Camino Del Rio South 210

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan, Olga Y.

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Hoynacki, David A

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ashmore Dental Group Corporation.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by McCourt DDS, Danielle.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Da Luz, Maria.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Da Luz, Maria.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ashmore Dental Group Corporation.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Ashmore Dental Group Corporation.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by McCourt DDS, Danielle.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by McCourt DDS, Danielle.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Da Luz, Maria.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Da Luz, Maria .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ashmore Dental Group Corporation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to McCourt DDS, Danielle .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Da Luz, Maria.; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Da Luz, Maria.; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by plaintiff and defendant. Jury fees due by 09/10/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Da Luz, Maria.; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ashmore Dental Group Corporation.; Filed By: Ashmore Dental Group Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by McCourt DDS, Danielle.; Filed By: McCourt DDS, Danielle (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Da Luz, Maria. Refers to: McCourt DDS, Danielle; Ashmore Dental Group Corporation; Filed By: Da Luz, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less