This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 08:04:10 (UTC).

D A Whitacre Construction Inc vs Team C Construction

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 D A Whitacre Construction Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Team C Construction. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Padre Dam Municipal Water District

Team C Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bush, Kristen M

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & EVANS LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Cauley, Kevin T

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & EVANS LLP

101 W Broadway # 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Flaherty, Douglas P

402 West Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Complaint

Complaint filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.

Answer

Answer filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Team C Construction.

Answer

Answer filed by Team C Construction.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Team C Construction.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Padre Dam Municipal Water District

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC; D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Padre Dam Municipal Water District

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Team C Construction

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC; D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC.; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC.; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Team C Construction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Padre Dam Municipal Water District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.; Filed By: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.; Filed By: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Team C Construction.; Filed By: Team C Construction (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC; D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff); D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC; D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff); D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC. Refers to: Team C Construction; Padre Dam Municipal Water District; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: D A WHITACRE CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Padre Dam Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where Team C Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Flaherty, Douglas P