This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 11:45:32 (UTC).

Cyth Systems Inc vs Martinez

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Cyth Systems Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martinez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cyth Systems Inc

Defendant

Martinez, Jose Maria Guadalupe Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk, J. Douglas

2201 Dupont Dr #820

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorney

Pelochino, Joseph E

Attorney at ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH BELL LLP

4275 Executive Square #700

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Martinez, Jose Maria Guadalupe Gomez.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cyth Systems Inc. Refers to: Martinez, Jose

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Martinez, Jose Maria Guadalupe Gomez.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/11/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/06/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Defendant's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Martinez, Jose Maria Guadalupe Gomez.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/19/2021 10:15:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/13/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/16/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

Notice - Other (of Continued Case Management Conference) filed by Cyth Systems Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Martinez, Jose Maria Guadalupe Gomez.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cyth Systems Inc.; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Cyth Systems Inc.; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/11/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/06/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/11/2022 at 01:30PM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Cyth Systems Inc. Refers to: Martinez, Jose; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/19/2021 at 10:20:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cyth Systems Inc. Refers to: Martinez, Jose; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cyth Systems Inc. Refers to: Martinez, Jose; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cyth Systems Inc. Refers to: Martinez, Jose; Filed By: Cyth Systems Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cyth Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRK, J. DOUGLAS