This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 08:12:58 (UTC).

Cypress Insurance Company vs Silva

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Cypress Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Silva. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cypress Insurance Company

Defendants

Silva, Julian

Applebee & Sheehan Inc; DBA : Airtek Indoor Solutions

Applebee & Sheehan Inc; DBA : Airtek Air Indoor Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoeck, Michael D

Attorney at SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc

Amended Complaint (Amendments)

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Amended Complaint (Amendments)

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Michael D Schoeck) filed by Cypress Insurance Company.

Order - Other (Order)

Proposed Order submitted by Cypress Insurance Company received but not filed on 05/21/2021.

Motion for Leave to Amend (Motions)

Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Cypress Insurance Company.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Cypress Insurance Company received but not filed on 05/21/2021. Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Michael D Schoeck) filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cypress Insurance Company. Refers to: Silva, Julian; Applebee & Sheehan Inc Filed By: Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APPLEBEE AND SHEEHAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Airtek Indoor Air Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D