This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 15:48:33 (UTC).

C&S Technical Resources Inc vs Coast Air Center LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 C S Technical Resources Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Coast Air Center LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C&S Technical Resources Inc; DBA : C&S Construction Services

Defendants

COAST AIR CENTER LLC

ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST

FIRST CHOICE BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DeSantis, Kevin V.

Rupe, Ryan G.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST

Complaint

Complaint filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST

Notice of Recording of Pendency of Action

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc.

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc.; Filed By: C&S Technical Resources Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to C&S Technical Resources Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to FIRST CHOICE BANK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to COAST AIR CENTER LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc.; Filed By: C&S Technical Resources Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST; Filed By: C&S Technical Resources Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST; Filed By: C&S Technical Resources Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by C&S Technical Resources Inc. Refers to: COAST AIR CENTER LLC; FIRST CHOICE BANK; ENTERPRISE BANK AND TRUST; Filed By: C&S Technical Resources Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less