This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:44:56 (UTC).

Crystal Hilsley vs Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 Crystal Hilsley filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILSLEY, CRYSTAL

Defendants

OCEAN SPRAY CRANBERRIES INC

ARNOLD WORLDWIDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIOT, DAVID

3200 Fourth Avenue 207

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorneys

SIEGLER, ADAM

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

SHACKELFORD, RICK L

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc.

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.

Answer filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc.

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Arnold Worldwide, LLC

Answer filed by Arnold Worldwide LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Arnold Worldwide LLC. Filed By: Arnold Worldwide LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc. Filed By: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc. Filed By: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC Filed By: Hilsley, Crystal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC Filed By: Hilsley, Crystal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Hilsley, Crystal. Refers to: Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc; Arnold Worldwide LLC Filed By: Hilsley, Crystal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc Welfare Benefits Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Elliot