This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 13:03:19 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management LLC vs Ney

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Crown Asset Management LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ney. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management LLC

Defendant

Ney, Meakara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farzin, Ali

Attorney at FARMAR LAW GROUP PC

14900 Magnolia Blvd 55997

Van Nuys, CA 91403

Defendant Attorney

Merritt, Tyneia

Attorney at NATIONAL LITIGATION LAW GROUP

2401 Nw 23Rd St Suite 42

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-61 to Katherine Bacal effective 01/15/2021

Answer

Answer filed by Ney, Meakara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Crown Asset Management LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Ney, Meakara .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Crown Asset Management LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-61 to Katherine Bacal effective 01/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ney, Meakara. Filed By: Ney, Meakara (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Crown Asset Management LLC. Refers to: Ney, Meakara Filed By: Crown Asset Management LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less