This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 07:09:19 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) vs Maxcy

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank KAY JEWELERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maxcy. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS)

Defendant

MAXCY, CODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siduguen, Christine

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM LLP

250 Sunnyslope Road Suite 300

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorney

Shepard, Robert L

1913 Edgewood Ln

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY

Declaration Re: Venue

Declaration - Other filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS).

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by MAXCY, CODY.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-03; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by MAXCY, CODY.; Filed By: MAXCY, CODY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS).; Filed By: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY; Filed By: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY; Filed By: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY; Filed By: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS). Refers to: MAXCY, CODY; Filed By: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (KAY JEWELERS) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEPARD, ROBERT L.