This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:10:07 (UTC).

Crimmins VS Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Crimmins filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crimmins, Dennis

Defendants

Azimipour, Bahar

Carroll, Suzanne M

Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC

Shaver, Charlie

The Carlyle Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cantor, Zachary

1112 Montana Ave

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Mesriani, Rodney

510 Arizona Ave

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar

Complaint

Complaint filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crimmins, Dennis.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Crimmins, Dennis.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Filed By: Crimmins, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Filed By: Crimmins, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar Filed By: Crimmins, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar Filed By: Crimmins, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Crimmins, Dennis. Refers to: Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC; The Carlyle Group Inc; Shaver, Charlie; Carroll, Suzanne; Azimipour, Bahar Filed By: Crimmins, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less