Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 13:21:34 (UTC).

Credit Corp Solutions INC vs Yousif

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Credit Corp Solutions INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yousif. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Corp Solutions Inc

Defendant

Yousif, Basil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rivera, Adam Michael

Attorney at PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

 

Court Documents

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (with Dismissal of DOES) filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc was denied. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) submitted by Credit Corp Solutions Inc rejected on 08/13/2020. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc was denied. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) submitted by Credit Corp Solutions Inc rejected on 08/13/2020. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (with Dismissal of DOES) filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Credit Corp Solutions Inc. Refers to: Yousif, Basil Filed By: Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIVERA, ADAM MICHAEL