This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 01:34:11 (UTC).

Craney vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Craney filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craney, Clarence

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David, Chad Allen

1 Ridgegate Drive 245

Temecula, CA 92590

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Craney, Clarence. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Craney, Clarence.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Craney, Clarence.

Craney_POS of Summons

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Craney, Clarence. Refers to: General Motors LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Craney, Clarence. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Craney, Clarence (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Craney, Clarence.; Filed By: Craney, Clarence (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Craney, Clarence.; Filed By: Craney, Clarence (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Craney, Clarence. Refers to: General Motors LLC; Filed By: Craney, Clarence (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David, Chad A.