This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 10:18:46 (UTC).

Craig vs Katerra Inc

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Craig filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Katerra Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig, Justin

Defendant

Katerra Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tillmon, Seth E

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SETH E TILLMON

16350 Ventura Blvd D

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Craig, Justin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Craig, Justin. Filed By: Craig, Justin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Katerra Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Craig, Justin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc Filed By: Craig, Justin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc Filed By: Craig, Justin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc Filed By: Craig, Justin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Craig, Justin. Refers to: Katerra Inc Filed By: Craig, Justin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TILLMON SETH E. ESQ.