This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 05:58:51 (UTC).

COY vs. AIELLO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 COY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AIELLO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COY, JEFFREY H

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE

AIELLO, MARIA

AIELLO, PAT ; AKA : AIELLO, PASQUALE J

AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION

D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE ; AKA : D'ACQUISTO, SAL

MCMILLIN REALTY

SAL D ACQUISTO REAL ESTATE GROUP

SOLORZANO, KAREN

TORREGIANI, ANTHONY

SALVATORE D'ACQUISTO; DBA : SALVATORE D'ACQUISTO REAL ESTATE GROUP;ESA : SALVATORE D'ACQUISTO AKA SAL D'ACQUISTO AKA SAL D'ACQUISTO REAL ESTATE GROUP

AIELLO, PAT ; AKA : AIELLO, PASQUALE JOSEPH;DBA : AIELLO CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING

D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE ; AKA : D'ACQUISTO, SAL;DBA : SAL D'ACQUISTO REAL ESTATE GROUP

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McGahey, Harry Vernon Jr

1532 Sixth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PASTORE, JOSEPH A

3570 Camino Del Rio North 103

San Diego, CA 92108

SIMPSON, JOHN A

Attorney at SIMPSON DELMORE GREENE LLP

One America Plaza, 600 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

GOWER, GRACE

Attorney at SIMPSON DELMORE GREENE LLP

600 W Broadway Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92101

THOMPSON, ANN MARIE

Attorney at SUNDERLAND MCCUTCHAN LLP

11770 Bernardo Plaza Ct #310

San Diego, CA 92128

MURPHY, JASON M

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

402 W Broadway 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/16/2016 at 09:45:00 AM in C-61 before John S. Meyer at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by TORREGIANI, ANTHONY.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Lodgment in support of Motion of Plaintiff Jeffrey Coy to Permit Financial Discovery of Defendant Aiellos Financial Condition and Wrongful Profits

Notice of Lodgment filed by COY, JEFFREY H.

Declaration of Plaintiff Jeffrey Coy in support of motion for Order to Permit Pretrial Discovery of Financial Assets of Solorzano and Structure of McMillin Realty

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Plaintiff Jeffrey Coy) filed by COY, JEFFREY H.

in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Extending Dismissal Calendar for Conditional Settlement

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Extending Dismissal Calendar for Conditional Settlement) filed by COY, JEFFREY H.

Proof of Service for Ex Parte Motion for Extending Dismissal Calendar for Conditional Settlement

Proof of Service filed by COY, JEFFREY H.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/10/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Complaint

Complaint filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY

Answer

Answer filed by AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; SOLORZANO, KAREN; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; MCMILLIN REALTY

Answer

Answer filed by MCMILLIN REALTY.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by MCMILLIN REALTY.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by AIELLO, PAT.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY.

MCMILLIN REALTY Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by SOLORZANO, KAREN; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY; MCMILLIN REALTY. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to MCMILLIN REALTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to SOLORZANO, KAREN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to AIELLO, MARIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to AIELLO, PAT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to TORREGIANI, ANTHONY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Salvatore D'Acquisto.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to TORREGIANI, ANTHONY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE .

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, MARIA Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; Salvatore D'Acquisto Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2016 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by COY, JEFFREY H. Refers to: AIELLO, PAT; AIELLO, MARIA; AIELLOS CONSTRUCTION; AIELLO CONSTRUCTION & MAINTENANCE; D ACQUISTO, SALVATORE; Salvatore D'Acquisto; TORREGIANI, ANTHONY; SOLORZANO, KAREN; MCMILLIN REALTY Filed By: COY, JEFFREY H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less