This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 15:13:10 (UTC).

Cox Enterprises LLC vs Peiler

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Cox Enterprises LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Peiler. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cox Enterprises LLC; DBA : Home Helpers Home Care of North San Diego

Cox, Brenda

Cox, Christopher

Defendants

Mana Home Care LLC

Peiler, Cheryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gould, Evan A

Attorney at THE GOULD FIRM

9988 Hibert Street 301

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorneys

Craven, Shelby

Attorney at LAGASSE BRANCH BELL KINKEAD LLP

4365 Executive Drive 950

San Diego, CA 92121

Jones, Andrea N

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

1350 Columbia St Unit 303

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher. Refers to: Peiler, Cheryl; Mana Home Care LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Peiler, Cheryl.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Peiler, Cheryl.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Peiler, Cheryl.

Answer

Answer filed by Mana Home Care LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mana Home Care LLC.; Filed By: Mana Home Care LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Peiler, Cheryl.; Filed By: Peiler, Cheryl (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Peiler, Cheryl.; Filed By: Peiler, Cheryl (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Peiler, Cheryl.; Filed By: Peiler, Cheryl (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher.; Filed By: Cox Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); Cox, Brenda (Plaintiff); Cox, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher.; Filed By: Cox Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); Cox, Brenda (Plaintiff); Cox, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cox Enterprises LLC; Cox, Brenda; Cox, Christopher. Refers to: Peiler, Cheryl; Mana Home Care LLC; Filed By: Cox Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); Cox, Brenda (Plaintiff); Cox, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cox Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craven, Shelby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Andrea N