This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 04:02:59 (UTC).

Cortez vs Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Cortez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cortez, Adrian

Defendant

Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Notice of Lodgment- Small Claims, Exhibits/Evidence) filed by Cortez, Adrian. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Cortez, Adrian. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: 1104; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Notice of Lodgment- Small Claims, Exhibits/Evidence) filed by Cortez, Adrian. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Cortez, Adrian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in 1104 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Cortez, Adrian. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Cortez, Adrian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less