Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 03:13:08 (UTC).

Correa VS 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Correa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Correa, Maria

Defendants

24 Hour Fitness USA Inc

Core Health & Fitness LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luneau, Thomas Damian

Defendant Attorney

Lothyan, Jonna D

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Core Health & Fitness LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by Core Health & Fitness LLC.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Participant) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Core Health & Fitness LLC) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: Core Health & Fitness LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Core Health & Fitness LLC. Filed By: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Core Health & Fitness LLC. Filed By: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Core Health & Fitness LLC) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: Core Health & Fitness LLC Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Participant) filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Correa, Maria. Refers to: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc; Core Health & Fitness LLC Filed By: Correa, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORE HEALTH & FITNESS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lothyan, Jonna D