This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 09:08:49 (UTC).

Corley vs Sedona Staffing Inc

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Corley filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Sedona Staffing Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corley, Lorena

Defendants

Phone Ware Inc

Sedona Staffing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lovretovich, Joseph M

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Kim, Briana M

Attorney at JML LAW

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Cato, Christopher B.

At&T Building, 101 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

DeLaCruz, Alfred Michael

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

225 Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc; Phone Ware Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc; Phone Ware Inc

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc

Order - Other (Order)

Order - Other filed by Sedona Staffing Inc.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to further extend time to respond) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Phone Ware Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Phone Ware Inc.

ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Order - Other (TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc.

STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena.

Order - Other (Order)

Order - Other (Re Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc.

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena; Phone Ware Inc.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Re Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena; Phone Ware Inc. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant); Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff); Phone Ware Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by Sedona Staffing Inc. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Phone Ware Inc. Filed By: Phone Ware Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Phone Ware Inc. Filed By: Phone Ware Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to further extend time to respond) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant); Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) filed by Sedona Staffing Inc; Corley, Lorena. Filed By: Sedona Staffing Inc (Defendant); Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc; Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc; Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Corley, Lorena. Refers to: Sedona Staffing Inc; Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Corley, Lorena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA LEASING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Phone Ware Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM BRIANA MINSUN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVRETOVICH, JOSEPH M