This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 22:28:39 (UTC).

Cordero vs. Tri Pack Enterprises Inc

Case Summary

On 06/23/2014 Cordero filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Cordero, Jeffrey

Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises

JEFFREY CORDERO DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT TRI PACK ENTERPRISES INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Abbott, Joe

Stratton, Cynthia L

McNeal, William

Tri Pack Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Stratton, Cynthia L

Attorney at STRATTON & GREEN ALC

3703 Camino Del Rio South 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAWEKOTTE, ROBERT

Attorney at BLASCO & HAWEKOTTE GCS

29 Centaurus Way

Coto De Caza, CA 92679

MOORE, JOEY PETER

Attorney at JOEY P MOORE A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

420 Exchange Street 270

Irvine, CA 92602

Plaintiff

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe; Tri Pack Enterprises Inc

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe.

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Motion for Preliminary Injunction (9/12/14) filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc.

Non-Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Opposition - Other (Non-Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 9/12/14) filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (9/12 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Order - Other (7/1/15) submitted by Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; Cordero, Jeffrey received but not filed on 06/26/2015.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (11/6/15) filed by Cordero, Jeffrey.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (11/6/15) filed by Cordero, Jeffrey.

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 99]

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (12/11/15) filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (12/11/15) filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (12/11/15) filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe.

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 116]

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 116]

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 116]

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc.

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Filed By: Cordero, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/18/2015 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2016 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Filed By: Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 11/06/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 116]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 116]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 116]

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2014
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/10/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 08/06/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe; Tri Pack Enterprises Inc Filed By: Cordero, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe Filed By: Cordero, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe Filed By: Cordero, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Cordero, Jeffrey; Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Tri Pack Enterprises Inc; McNeal, William; Abbott, Joe Filed By: Cordero, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Cordero derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant Tri Pack Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.