This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 07:41:15 (UTC).

Cooper vs Gray

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Cooper filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gray. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cooper, Rebecca

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KAG CONSULTING INC

GRAY, KENNETH

MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC

21st Century Wellness Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Michael B

Attorney at YOFFE & COOPER

3713 Highland Avenue 2

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence, Amy B.

2550 N Hollywood Way # 202

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Errata and Correction to Plaintiff's complaint) filed by Cooper, Rebecca.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; 21st Century Wellness Inc. Refers to: Cooper, Rebecca

Summons (Cross-Complaint)

Original Summons (X-Complaint) filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; 21st Century Wellness Inc. Refers to: Cooper, Rebecca

Answer

Answer filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Transfer Action to the Superior Court of Los Angeles County) filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to transfer case to LA) submitted by Cooper, Rebecca rejected on 04/02/2019.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (in Support of Plaintiff's 30 Day Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading) filed by Cooper, Rebecca.

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (in Support of Plaintiff's 30 Day Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading) filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; 21st Century Wellness Inc. Refers to: Cooper, Rebecca Filed By: KAG CONSULTING INC (Cross - Complainant); GRAY, KENNETH (Cross - Complainant); MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC (Cross - Complainant); 21st Century Wellness Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (X-Complaint) filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; 21st Century Wellness Inc. Refers to: Cooper, Rebecca Filed By: KAG CONSULTING INC (Cross - Complainant); GRAY, KENNETH (Cross - Complainant); MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC (Cross - Complainant); 21st Century Wellness Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC. Filed By: KAG CONSULTING INC (Defendant); GRAY, KENNETH (Defendant); MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Transfer Action to the Superior Court of Los Angeles County) filed by KAG CONSULTING INC; GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC. Filed By: KAG CONSULTING INC (Defendant); GRAY, KENNETH (Defendant); MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to transfer case to LA) submitted by Cooper, Rebecca rejected on 04/02/2019. Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Errata and Correction to Plaintiff's complaint) filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Cooper, Rebecca. Refers to: GRAY, KENNETH; MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC; KAG CONSULTING INC Filed By: Cooper, Rebecca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE AMY B. ESQ.