This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 09:48:04 (UTC).

Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. vs. Sadler Electric Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2012 Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sadler Electric Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.

Defendants

Allegheny Casualty Company

Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District

Sadler Electric Inc.

Grossmont Union High School District

GORDON-PRILL SAN DIEGO, INC.

FIRST SEALORD SURETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAYNE, MICHAEL

Attorney at GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER & SENET LLP

149 S Barrington Avenue 143

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Defendant Attorney

GARFIELD, TIMOTHY K

Attorney at WORLEY SCHWARTZ GARFIELD & PRAIRIE LLP

401 B Street 2400

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Sadler Electric Inc.; Allegheny Casualty Company

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc..

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc..

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Allegheny Casualty Company

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 11/02/2012 11:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc..

Answer

Answer filed by Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default was rescheduled to 05/03/2013 at 11:00:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: GORDON-PRILL SAN DIEGO, INC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default was rescheduled to 06/07/2013 at 11:00:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/12/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GORDON-PRILL SAN DIEGO, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Grossmont Union High School District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference set for 07-12-2013 at 10:30am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default set for 07-12-2013 at 10:30am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District. Filed By: Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Sadler Electric Inc.; Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District; Allegheny Casualty Company; Grossmont Union High School District; GORDON-PRILL SAN DIEGO, INC.; FIRST SEALORD SURETY Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Commencement of Action) filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Sadler Electric Inc.; Allegheny Casualty Company Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Sadler Electric Inc.; Allegheny Casualty Company Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Refers to: Sadler Electric Inc.; Allegheny Casualty Company; Grossmont Union High School District Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less