This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 20:25:55 (UTC).

Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc vs 4061 38th Street LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 4061 38th Street LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSOLIDATED ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTORS INC

Defendants

4061 38TH STREET LLC

LEVEL 3 CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EATON, LUKE N

Attorney at PEPPER HAMILTON LLP

350 S Grand Avenue 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

LEER, JACK R

Attorney at CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP

12340 El Camino Real Suite 430

San Diego, CA 92130

LICHTENSTEIN, DAVID H

Attorney at CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP

3398 Carmel Mountain Rd Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92121

ZAPPATERRENO, CASSANDRA J.

Attorney at HOGAN ZAPPATERRENO LLP

348 E Olive Avenue E1

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order RE Dismissal of CED Action

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Order RE Dismissal of CED Action) filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc; 4061 38th Street LLC; ITAM PLASTERING INC; Tekworks Inc; Level 3 Construction inc; ALR Nevada Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice of Related Case submitted by Level 3 Construction inc rejected on 02/14/2019.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Amended Complaint (2nd) submitted by Level 3 Construction inc rejected on 02/20/2019.

For leave to amend

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (For leave to amend) filed by ALR Nevada Inc; 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc; ITAM PLASTERING INC; Tekworks Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by 4061 38th Street LLC. Refers to: Mahon, Ian

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Level 3 Construction Inc; Mahon, Ian.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tekworks Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tekworks Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ITAM PLASTERING INC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ITAM PLASTERING INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38TH STREET LLC.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38TH STREET LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Case Management Statement; Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee) filed by 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38th Street LLC; 4061 38TH STREET LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ALR Nevada Inc. Filed By: ALR Nevada Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (For leave to amend) filed by ALR Nevada Inc; 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc; ITAM PLASTERING INC; Tekworks Inc. Filed By: ALR Nevada Inc (Plaintiff); 4061 38th Street LLC (Defendant); Level 3 Construction inc (Defendant); ITAM PLASTERING INC (Defendant); Tekworks Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (2nd) submitted by Level 3 Construction inc rejected on 02/20/2019. Filed By: Level 3 Construction inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case submitted by Level 3 Construction inc rejected on 02/14/2019. Filed By: Level 3 Construction inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Order RE Dismissal of CED Action) filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc; 4061 38th Street LLC; ITAM PLASTERING INC; Tekworks Inc; Level 3 Construction inc; ALR Nevada Inc. Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff); 4061 38th Street LLC (Defendant); ITAM PLASTERING INC (Interested Party); Tekworks Inc (Interested Party); Level 3 Construction inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Level 3 Construction inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to 4061 38th Street LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Refers to: 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Refers to: 4061 38th Street LLC Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/03/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Refers to: 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Refers to: 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. Refers to: 4061 38th Street LLC; Level 3 Construction inc Filed By: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less