This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 09:00:53 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Maxine M. Rojem

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Conservatorship of Maxine M Rojem was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

Fox, Susan K.

Conservatee

Rojem, Maxine M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

Luhnow, Keeley Canning

Conservatee Attorney

Cahill, Robin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Petition for General Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Expire 7/16/2020) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketSurety Bond ($45,100) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Other (First Supplement to Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte - Temporary Conservatorship heard 05/05/2020 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration re Ex Parte Notice) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet (Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCourt Appointed Attorney Report (Report and Recommendations of Court-Appointed Counsel for the Proposed Conservatee Regarding Emergency Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of Person and Estate filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Proposed Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for General Appointment of Conservator scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine; Fox, Susan Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCitation - Conservatorship filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketReferral Information and List of Relatives (Confidential) filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information filed by Fox, Susan K.. Refers to: Rojem, Maxine Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Fox, Susan K.. Filed By: Fox, Susan K. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.