This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/03/2020 at 01:51:53 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Marjorie Wells

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Conservatorship of Marjorie Wells was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kennedy, Nancy

Conservatee

Wells, Marjorie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Paul, Elise

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELISE PAUL APC

Conservatee Attorney

SMITH, JOHN SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of Estate Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for General Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Estate Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketThe Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator was rescheduled to 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketThe Petition for General Appointment of Conservator was rescheduled to 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for General Appointment of Conservator scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSurety Bond ($123,200.00 (Temporary Conservator)) filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Letters Expire 04/16/2020) filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship (John Lockie M.D.) filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship (Donald Adema D.O.) filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (And Letters) submitted by Kennedy, Nancy received but not filed on 02/13/2020. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (Temporary Order and Letters) submitted by Kennedy, Nancy received but not filed on 02/13/2020. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for General Appointment of Conservator scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of Estate Only filed by Kennedy, Nancy. Filed By: Kennedy, Nancy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA#10) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.