This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 02:06:14 (UTC).

Conservatorship of David B. Cooke

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Conservatorship of David B Cooke was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John B Scherling. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John B Scherling

 

Party Details

Conservatee and Petitioner

Cooke, David B

Conservator

Bogdanovich, Donna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

COHEN, JEFFREY S

Hoff, Jonathan D

Yoshitake, Alan T.

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for General Appointment of Conservator - Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator - Competing Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Expire: 04/01/2021) filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Expire 01/07/2021) filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte - Temporary Conservatorship heard 02/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator heard 12/03/2020 01:45:00 PM. (As Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Temporary Conservatorship (Amended) filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator - Competing Petition filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of Person Only ((Ex Parte)) filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration Re Notice of Ex Parte) filed by Cooke, David B. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Appointing Temporary Conservator) submitted by Cooke, David B received but not filed on 11/13/2020. Filed By: Cooke, David B (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for General Appointment of Conservator scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Temporary Conservatorship scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 03:15:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less