This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/08/2018 at 04:01:13 (UTC).

Comerica Bank vs. Main & Best Inc

Case Summary

On 07/21/2009 Comerica Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Main Best Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMERICA BANK

Defendants

HALLAK, DAVID S

MAIN & BEST INC

GARMO, RICHARD F

HALLAK & GARMO PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRMAN, ALAN M

Attorney at MIRMAN BUBMAN & NAHMIAS LLP

21860 Burbank Blvd Suite 360

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

GARMO, FREDDY

Attorney at GARMO & GARMO LLP

124 W Main Street 200

El Cajon, CA 92020

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2009 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/10/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/05/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/02/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/16/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 05/14/2010 at 10:30:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATION/ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) submitted by Comerica Bank rejected on 05/06/2010.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/20/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents submitted by Comerica Bank rejected on 06/01/2010.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/25/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/29/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/09/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/17/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2010 10:30:00 AM.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT) submitted by Comerica Bank rejected on 07/12/2012. Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Comerica Bank. Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketOrder - Other (ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL ACCOUNTING, DISCHARGING RECEIVER AND EXONERATING ALL BONDS) filed by Comerica Bank. Refers to: Hoffman, William Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/08/2012 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketCase file location changed to East County Courthouse E-Civil/Small Claims Business Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by Comerica Bank. Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketMotion - Other (to Discharge the Receiver and Exonerate all Bonds) filed by Hoffman, William J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/13/2012 10:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hallak, David S. Refers to: Comerica Bank Filed By: Hallak, David S (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2009 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Granted) filed by Comerica Bank. Refers to: Garmo, Richard Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Comerica Bank. Refers to: Main & Best Inc; Hallak & Garmo Properties LLC Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Comerica Bank. Refers to: Hallak, David Filed By: Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Comerica Bank.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Comerica Bank.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Comerica Bank.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comerica Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRMAN ALAN M.