This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 08:16:38 (UTC).

COLOMBO VS BANK OF AMERICA NA

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 COLOMBO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colombo, David

La Mesa, CA 91942

Defendants

BAC Home Loans Servicing LP

Bank of America NA

Countrywide Home Loans Inc

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

National Default Servicing Corporation

US Bank NA

Wells Fargo Bank NA

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA

Complaint

Complaint filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Colombo, David.

Returned Mail

Returned Mail (of order on court fee waiver for David A Colombo) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail (of order on court fee waiver for David A Colombo) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Colombo, David. Filed By: Colombo, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA Filed By: Colombo, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA Filed By: Colombo, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Colombo, David. Filed By: Colombo, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Colombo, David. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc; National Default Servicing Corporation; BAC Home Loans Servicing LP; Countrywide Home Loans Inc; US Bank NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA Filed By: Colombo, David (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant