This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 12:37:27 (UTC).

Cody Cameron vs. Mark B Drucker MD

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 Cody Cameron filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Mark B Drucker MD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMERON, CODY

FARAH MELANSON AS SUCESSORS IN INTEREST OF ELADIO REYES, DECEASED

MELANSON, FARAH

CAMERON, ADAM

ADAM CAMERON AS SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF ELADIO REYES

Defendants

DRUCKER MD, MARK B

CENTER FOR ADVANCED MEDICINE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRESTICK, MICHAEL L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL L TRESTICK

402 West Broadway 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

DEUPREY, DAN H

Attorney at DEUPREY LAW FIRM LLP

1901 First Avenue 330

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - Other

Affidavit - Other (OF CODY CAMERON) filed by Cameron, Cody; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased; Melanson, Farah.

Affidavit - Other

Affidavit - Other (OF FARAH MELANSON) filed by Cameron, Cody; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased; Melanson, Farah.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp

Complaint

Complaint filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDIGNS) filed by Drucker MD, Mark B.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case (FINAL JUDGMENT ON DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN ORDER OF LIQUIDATION) filed by Drucker MD, Mark B.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Drucker MD, Mark B; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp. Refers to: Adam Cameron as successors in interest of Eladio Reyes; Cameron, Adam; Cameron, Cody

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Drucker MD, Mark B; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp. Refers to: Adam Cameron as successors in interest of Eladio Reyes; Cameron, Adam; Cameron, Cody

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cameron, Cody.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cameron, Cody.

Answer

Answer filed by Drucker MD, Mark B; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp. Refers to: Cameron, Cody; Cameron, Adam; Adam Cameron as successors in interest of Eladio Reyes

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1ST) filed by Cameron, Cody; Cameron, Adam; Adam Cameron as successors in interest of Eladio Reyes. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request - Other (STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND REJECTED) submitted by Cameron, Cody rejected on 05/30/2017.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDIGNS) filed by Drucker MD, Mark B. Filed By: Drucker MD, Mark B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/01/2018 at 10:15:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case (FINAL JUDGMENT ON DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN ORDER OF LIQUIDATION) filed by Drucker MD, Mark B. Filed By: Drucker MD, Mark B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Jury demanded by .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 08:30AM before Judge Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/01/2018 at 10:15AM before Judge Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 12 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (OF CODY CAMERON) filed by Cameron, Cody; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased; Melanson, Farah. Filed By: Cameron, Cody (Plaintiff); Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased (Plaintiff); Melanson, Farah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (OF FARAH MELANSON) filed by Cameron, Cody; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased; Melanson, Farah. Filed By: Cameron, Cody (Plaintiff); Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased (Plaintiff); Melanson, Farah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp Filed By: Cameron, Cody (Plaintiff); Melanson, Farah (Plaintiff); Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp Filed By: Cameron, Cody (Plaintiff); Melanson, Farah (Plaintiff); Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Cameron, Cody; Melanson, Farah; Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased. Refers to: Drucker MD, Mark; Center for Advanced Medicine Corp Filed By: Cameron, Cody (Plaintiff); Melanson, Farah (Plaintiff); Farah Melanson as sucessors in interest of Eladio Reyes, deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Center for Advanced Medicine, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRESTICK MICHAEL LAUGHLIN